
Arundeep
 
MULTIPLICATION BY FOUR DIGITNUMBERS : Ex. 1 : Solve => (1) 1234 x 5678 =?Soln : (1) 1234 x 5678 = ?
So answer is 7006652. Practice Question Solve the following: (1) 5712 x 4334 (2) 5156 x 4278 (3) 3899 x 4388 (4) 5666 x 9255 (5) 8137 x 1983 ANSWERS : (1) 24755808 (2) 22057368 (3) 17108812 (4) 52438830 (5) 16135671  