
Arundeep
 
MULTIPLICATION BY TWO DIGITNUMBERS : Ex. 1 : Solve => (1) 12x13 =? (2) 17x18 =? (3) 87x92 =?Soln : (1) 12 x 13 = ? Step I. Multiply the righthand digits of multiplicand and multiplier (unitdigit of multiplicand with unitdigit of the multplier).
Step II. Now, do crossmultiplication, ie, multiply 3 by 1 and 1 by2.
Add the two products and write down to the left of 6.
Step III. In the last step we multiply the lefthand figures of both
multiplicand and multiplier.
So answer is 156. Soln : (2) 17 x 18 = ?
So answer is 306. Soln : (3) 87 x 92 = ?
So answer is 8004. Practice Question Solve the following: (1) 57 x 43 (2) 51 x 42 (3) 38 x 43 (4) 56 x 92 (5) 81 x 19 (6) 23 x 99 (7) 29 x 69 (8) 62 x 71 (9) 17 x 37 (10) 97 x 89 ANSWERS : (1) 2451 (2) 2142 (3) 1634 (4) 5152 (5) 1539 (6) 2277 (7) 2001 (8) 4402 (9) 629 (10) 8633  