
Arundeep
 
MULTIPLICATION BY 12 : To multiply any number by 12, we"Double each digit in turn and add its neighbour". This is the same as multiplying by 11 except that now we double the "number" before we add its "neighbour". For example : Ex 1: Solve : 5324 X 12 = ? Soln :
The answer is 63,888. If you go through it your self you will find that the calculation goes very fast and is very easy. Practice Question Solve the following: (1)35609 X 12 (2)11123009 X 12 (3)456789 X 12 (4)22200007 X 12 (5)444890711 X 12 Ans : (1) 427308 (2) 133476108 (3) 5481468 (4) 266400084 (5) 5338688532  
Mukesh Mishra
 
This is very easy method learn multiplication  